Bagli, Darius Jehan (CPSO#: 69530)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital For Sick Children
Suite M292
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6899
Fax: (416) 813-6461
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador
USA - Massachusetts
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 17 May 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARIUS JEHAN BAGLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGLI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 May 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 May 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1998