Bagnall, Eric George (CPSO#: 53055)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2013