Baguio, Arnell Jumawid (CPSO#: 89935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Cebu Institute of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre /
Stronach Regional Cancer Center
Division of Palliative Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 952-3050
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arnell Baguio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Baguio ( CPSO# 89935 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Stronach Regional Cancer Center
Department of Palliative Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Feb 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARNELL JUMAWID BAGUIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGUIO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 13 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2009 to 20 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 2011