Baguley, Paul Edmund (CPSO#: 61557)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Oct 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
BMI Woodlands Hospital
Morton Park
Darlington DL1 4PL 
United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Plastic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Oct 1995