Bahadur, Yasir Abdulaziz (CPSO#: 67339)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 28 Jul 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 28 Jul 1997
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998