Bahal, Maglin Nitha (CPSO#: 83656)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: Vivera, Maglin Nitha (used until: 05 Dec 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ellis Park Medical
1959 Bloor Street West Units 2&3
Toronto, Ontario
M6S 1M4
Toronto ON  M6S 1M4
Phone: 416-639-6321
Fax: 416-639-6322
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Midtown health and Wellness
Suite 702
110 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 2Y1
Canada
Phone: (416) 486-3300
Fax: (416) 486-9433
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maglin Bahal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bahal ( CPSO# 83656 )

Business Address:
King West Village Medical
Suite 201
626 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5V 1M7
Phone Number: (416) 703-1313

Business Address:
602 - 110 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 2Y1
Phone Number: (416) 486-3300

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jul 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAGLIN NITHA BAHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2005 to 07 Sep 2005
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2005 to 21 Sep 2005
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2006