Bahl, Mala (CPSO#: 76712)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Thomas Jefferson University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4380
Fax: (519) 749-4378
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bahl Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 15 2013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALA BAHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2003