Bahoric, Boris (CPSO#: 63547)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Dec 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 1995


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, French, Italian

Education:University of Rijeka, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jewish General Hospital
3755 Cote Ste Catherine
Montreal QC  H3T 1E2
Phone: (514) 340-8288
Fax: (514) 340-7548

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. BORIS BAHORIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHORIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 May 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1995