Bahzad, Shakir F A M H (CPSO#: 97097)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 17 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 08 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Dec 2014