Bai, Helen Hee Kyung (CPSO#: 58514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1989


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Mississauga ON  L5N 2Y1
Phone: (905) 826-8993
Fax: (905) 826-0520
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Helen Bai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2009

Dr. H. Bai ( CPSO# 58514 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Mississauga ON  L5N 2Y1
Phone Number: (905) 826-8993

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga


Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. HELEN HEE KYUNG BAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1989