Baig, Jeremy David (CPSO#: 86327)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway-Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: 613-721-2000
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Baig Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Baig ( CPSO# 86327 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 18 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMY DAVID BAIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 18 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 19 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 05 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2016