Baigrie, Ronald Spencer (CPSO#: 22982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ronald Baigrie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2018


Corporation Name: Ronald Baigrie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Baigrie ( CPSO# 22982 )

Business Address:
200C - 65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8
Phone Number: (705) 674-5030

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 11 Apr 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD SPENCER BAIGRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIGRIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1970