Bailey, Brian Clare (CPSO#: 21879)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 1969

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 1969

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 316
17 Aberdeen Street
Ottawa ON  K1S 3J3
Phone: 613-233-9620
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

15 Aylmer Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 3S1
Canada
Phone: (819) 827-0363
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Suite 600
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN CLARE BAILEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAILEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 24 May 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1969

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 4, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)