Bailey, Christopher John (CPSO#: 50240)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher J. Bailey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr J.Boyes, Unit 1, 150 Strickland Street, Douro Dummer, ON K0L 2H0
Date Received: 16 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2015