Bailey, Denis John (CPSO#: 31293)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Department of Pathology University Health Network
Date Received: 23 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 21 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015