Bailey, Jason Malcolm (CPSO#: 83310)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Med-Team Clinic
99 Kakulu Road
Suite 103
Kanata ON  K2L3C8
Phone: 613-592-1448
Fax: 613-591-3778
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Bailey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bailey ( CPSO# 83310 )

Business Address:
103 - 99 Kakulu Road
Ottawa ON  K2L 3C8
Phone Number: (613) 592-1448

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jul 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON MALCOLM BAILEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAILEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2007