Bailey, Stewart Irving (CPSO#: 25644)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stewart I. Bailey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Site 800 Commissioners Road East London ON N6A 4G5 Tel: 519-685-8500 ext. 55363
Date Received: 20 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016