Baillie, Frank George (CPSO#: 28960)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Feb 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Glasgow, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department Of Surgery
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: (905) 577-9966
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

258 Northshore Boulevard West
Burlington ON  L7T 1A4
Canada
Phone: (905) 407-2184
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank Baillie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2007


Corporation Name: Frank Baillie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Baillie ( CPSO# 28960 )

Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 575-5743

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
6 North, Room 614
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANK GEORGE BAILLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAILLIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1977