Bailliu, Leslie Anne (CPSO#: 73688)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospitaal--713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Canadian Armed Forces- 713 Mtl Rd
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: 613-240-6468
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.A. Bailliu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 16 2009


Corporation Name: L.A. Bailliu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bailliu ( CPSO# 73688 )

Business Address:
Monfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE ANNE BAILLIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAILLIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 15 Jan 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 15 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2002