Baimel, Melanie Sarah (CPSO#: 89106)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
C753
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4037
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: 905-813-4530
Fax: 905-813-4548
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melanie Sarah Baimel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Baimel ( CPSO# 89106 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite C753
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4037

Business Address:
1835 Yonge Street
Suite 302
Toronto ON  M4S 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 487-0291

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE SARAH BAIMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIMEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010