Bain, Charles Edward Douglas (CPSO#: 52897)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993