Bain, James Ralph (CPSO#: 54242)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
1200 Main Street West
Room 4E16
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73222
Fax: (905) 521-9992
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Health Network
Cambridge Site
Unit 1
405 Maple Grove Road
Cambridge ON  N3E 1B6
Canada
Phone: (519) 653-9203
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Bain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bain ( CPSO# 54242 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
1200 Main Street West
Room 4E16
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
1 - 405 Maple Grove Road
Cambridge ON  N3E 1B6
Phone Number: (519) 653-9203

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES RALPH BAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 31 Dec 1985
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1986 to 30 Jun 1986
Research Fellows - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Research Fellows - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1985