Bain, Jerald (CPSO#: 19936)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1966

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1966

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yiddish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DOCUdavit Solutions Inc. Tel: (416) 781-9083
Date Received: 12 Jun 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JERALD BAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1966