Bain, Stanley Theodore (CPSO#: 14237)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1970 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1953
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Nov 1992
Summary:

 In November 1992, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bain guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he contravened while engaged in the 
 practice of medicine a federal, provincial or municipal law, regulation or rule or by-law of a 
 hospital designed to protect the public health, contrary to s. 27(20); and in that he failed to 
 maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21).  Consequently, the 
 Committee ordered that Dr. Bain be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on 
 the Register, and that his licence to practice be suspended for a period of two months.  The 
 Committee further ruled, however, that this suspension would itself be suspended provided that Dr. 
 Bain undertook and completed a course in bio-ethics, to the satisfaction of the Executive 
 Committee, within four months of this Order becoming final.  This course of study was to be under 
 the direction of an expert in bio-medical ethics, who was to be acceptable to the Registrar.

Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 08 Oct 1992