Baine, Sherri Dawn (CPSO#: 68476)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 503
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 226-4294
Fax: (416) 226-1928
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1100 Sheppard avenue east
North York ON  M2K 2W1
Canada
Phone: 4162505000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Dec 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERRI DAWN BAINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAINE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 20 Aug 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 21 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 20 Aug 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 21 Aug 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 20 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 21 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 13 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 14 Dec 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1998