Bainey, Kevin Rohan (CPSO#: 80326)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 19 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2003 to 14 Dec 2003
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Jul 2004 to 08 Aug 2004
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2004 to 19 Sep 2004
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011