Bains, Rekha (CPSO#: 50104)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Delhi, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jan 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 May 2004