Bair, Frederick Douglas (CPSO#: 71307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2
2125 Wyecroft Road
Oakville ON  L6L 5L7
Phone: (905) 338-0626
Fax: (905) 338-0384
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Douglas Bair Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Bair ( CPSO# 71307 )

Business Address:
2125 Wyecroft Road
Unit 2
Oakville ON  L6L 5L7
Phone Number: (905) 338-0626

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 05 Oct 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDERICK DOUGLAS BAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2001