Bairagi, Ranjana (CPSO#: 104635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Kwazulu-Natal, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London ON  N6A 5C1
Phone: 519 685 8500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth Bezuidenhout Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bairagi ( CPSO# 104635)
Dr. K. Bezuidenhout ( CPSO# 107821)

Business Address:
426 Talbot Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 1B9
Phone Number: (519) 633-4410

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANJANA BAIRAGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIRAGI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Jul 2014 to 10 Oct 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 16 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2014