Baird, John Burke (CPSO#: 67841)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Child Advocacy and
Assessment Program HSC 3N10
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73268
Fax: (905) 522-7982
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burke Baird Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Baird ( CPSO# 67841 )
Dr. J. Baird ( CPSO# 66870 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Child Advocacy and Assessment Program
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN BURKE BAIRD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIRD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1998