Baird, Michael Gavin Campbell (CPSO#: 23806)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael G. Baird Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 7 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Accuro Unit 1B 700 Industrial Avenue Ottawa, ON K1G 0Y9
Date Received: 18 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 10 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016