Bait Koora, Akram Zahir Mubarak (CPSO#: 107454)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 17 Aug 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

McMaster University, 18 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017