Baithoun, Hala Mumtaz Daoud (CPSO#: 108372)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 05 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 596-4200
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Iraq

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HALA MUMTAZ DAOUD BAITHOUN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BAITHOUN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. BAITHOUN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BAITHOUN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BAITHOUN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BAITHOUN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BAITHOUN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 04 Feb 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 05 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018