Bajaj, Girish (CPSO#: 87397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Delhi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
18 Kensington Rd
Suite 105
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone: (905) 497 2007
Fax: (905) 840 0999
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brampton Civic hospital
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J6
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: 4165864727
Fax: 4165864802
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Brampton Endoscopy Centre
10886 Hurontorio Street
Suite A 7
Brampton ON  L7A3R9
Canada
Phone: 9054955200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Girish Bajaj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bajaj ( CPSO# 87397 )

Business Address:
Brampton Endoscopy Centre
Suite A7
10886 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone Number: (905) 495-5200

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIRISH BAJAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAJAJ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2008