Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bajaj, Renu (CPSO#: 58331)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 901
570 University Avenue East
Waterloo ON  N2K 4P2
Phone: (519) 578-6099
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bajaj Sharad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bajaj ( CPSO# 58331 )
Dr. S. Sharad ( CPSO# 59047 )

Business Address:
901 - 570 University Avenue East
Waterloo ON  N2K 4P2
Phone Number: (519) 578-6099

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RENU BAJAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAJAJ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1988