Bajaj, Sangeeta (CPSO#: 66447)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: Chandra, Sangeeta (used until: 13 Aug 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Finchgate Medical Centre
Suite 314
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone: (905) 799-1850
Fax: (905) 799-2055
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sangeeta Bajaj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bajaj ( CPSO# 66447 )

Business Address:
Finchgate Medical Centre
314 - 40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone Number: (905) 799-1850

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 30 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANGEETA BAJAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAJAJ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Nov 1998
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1998