Bajwa, Riffet Rehana (CPSO#: 87783)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Oct 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Jul 2009
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 14 Jan 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2015

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 25, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Riffet Rehana Bajwa to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 25, 2015.

Dr. Riffet Rehana Bajwa was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence. In the face of these allegations, and as a result of Dr. Bajwa’s health issues that prevented a discipline hearing from taking place, Dr. Bajwa resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.

See PDF for full Undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)