Bak, David Michael (CPSO#: 64963)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 909
2 Pancake Lane
Fonthill ON  L0S 1E0
Phone: (905) 892-3242
Fax: (905) 892-2147
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bak ( CPSO# 64963 )

Business Address:
2 Pancake Lane
P.O. Box 909
Fonthill ON  L0S 1E9
Phone Number: (905) 892-3242

Business Address:
202 - 245 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X8
Phone Number: (905) 988-1933


Corporation Name: Bak, Grant, Zides Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MICHAEL BAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993