Bak, Melissa Margaret Martha (CPSO#: 106315)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Beamsville Medical Centre
4279 Hixon Street
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B0
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA MARGARET MARTHA BAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017