Bakanisi, Balisi Galani (CPSO#: 92685)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Zimbabwe, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Sunnyside Wing 245
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2010 to 20 Jul 2010
PEAP - Resident - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2010 to 20 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2011 to 20 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Balisi Galani Bakanisi may practise general surgery with St. Joseph's
                  Health Centre in Toronto, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by
                  a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires three years from
                  the date of issuance.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of  any  concerns regarding Dr.
                        Bakanisi's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the  required  reports to the College by the due  date  or  if  the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Bakanisi's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate  is issued on July 1, 2017, and will expire on or before
                  June 30, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.