Bakare, Tony Mufutau Oluwatoyin (CPSO#: 113743)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2017

Expiry Date:  16 Aug 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Belarussian State Medical University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Comprehensive Health Care Network
O'Connor Family Practice
943 O'Connor Drive
Toronto ON  M4B 2S7
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Comprehensive Health Care Network
Victoria Family Practice
1184 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto ON  M4B 2K6
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Comprehensive Health Care Network
Warden Family Practice
3502 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M1L 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Sep 2017 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Aug 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Tony Mufutau Oluwatoyin Bakare may practise family medicine with the
                  Comprehensive Health Care Network, while under supervision coordinated by
                  a supervisor  acceptable  to  the  College, at the following locations in
                  Toronto, Ontario:

                  (i)   O'Connor Family Practice;
                  
                  (ii)  Victoria Family Practice, and;
                  
                  (iii) Warden Family Practice.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  three  years from
                  the date of issuance.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor  notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Bakare's knowledge,  skill,  judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College  by  the  due  date  or  if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Bakare's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on August 17, 2017, and will expire  on  or
                  before August 16, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.