Baker, Andrew David (CPSO#: 71202)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hosptial
Wilson Site
1235 Wilson Ave.
Toronto
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000 Ext. 21800
Fax: 416-242-1058
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd.
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 747-3400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew D. Baker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Baker ( CPSO# 71202 )
Dr. A. Kuper ( CPSO# 76535 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
Wilson Site
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 13 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW DAVID BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001