Baker, Andrew John (CPSO#: 55694)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department Of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5559
Fax: (416) 864-6013
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Baker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Baker ( CPSO# 55694 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 705-0144

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW JOHN BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1986