Baker, Darrell Kurt (CPSO#: 43329)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
340 Lock Street West
Dunnville ON  N1A 1V5
Phone: (905) 774-7533
Fax: (905) 774-7534
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darrell Baker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Baker ( CPSO# 43329 )

Business Address:
340 Lock Street West
Dunnville ON  N1A 1V5
Phone Number: (905) 774-7533

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARRELL KURT BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1993