Baker, Jason Brian (CPSO#: 69423)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Mar 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Mar 1998

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Loblaws on the Mezzanine
396 St Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5P 3N3
Phone: (416) 928-9343
Fax: (416) 928-9368
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Christie Gardens
600 Melita Cres.
Toronto ON  M6G 3Z4
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hazelton Place
111 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 3J8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jason Baker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Baker ( CPSO# 69423 )
Dr. S. Morch ( CPSO# 69298 )

Business Address:
Loblaws on the Mezzanine
396 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5P 3N3
Phone Number: (416) 928-9343

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON BRIAN BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1998

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 12, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)