Baker, Jeffrey Paul (CPSO#: 26562)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Room 050 - 16th Floor Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5909
Fax: (416) 864-5995
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2 Champagne Dr unit B19
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2 Champagne Dr unit B19
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Canada
Phone: 416 645 5145
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.P. Baker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Baker ( CPSO# 26562 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Suite 16 - 050
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5909

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY PAUL BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Sep 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1981