Baker, Michael Allen (CPSO#: 24505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Apr 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
14 E B 227
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5300
Fax: (416) 340-3464
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Baker Cellarius Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Baker ( CPSO# 75529 )
Dr. M. Baker ( CPSO# 24505 )
Dr. V. Cellarius ( CPSO# 75498 )

Business Address:
St Michaels Hospital
Pediatric Clinic
2nd Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3655

Business Address:
The Hospital For Sick Children
Room 9402
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-5859

Business Address:
Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative Care
Mount Sinai Hospital
4th Floor
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 17 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALLEN BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1972