Baker, Stephen Michael (CPSO#: 63463)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 22 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Apr 1991 to 10 May 1991
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 May 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 2001