Baker, Stephen Richard (CPSO#: 69022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone: (416) 492-5888
Fax: (416) 492-6569
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN RICHARD BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000