Baker, Steven Kent (CPSO#: 75097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
Neuromuscular Disease Clinic
McMaster University HSC 2H22
1200 Main Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76946
Fax: (905) 521-2638
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1st Floor
355 Eglinton Ave. East
Toronto ON  M4P 1M5
Canada
Phone: 416-545-1000
Fax: 416-545-1901
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steven Baker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Baker ( CPSO# 75097 )

Business Address:
Medylex
355 Eglinton Avenue East
1st Floor
Toronto ON  M4P 1M5

Business Address:
Total Health Physio
1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9

Business Address:
Department of Medicine
Neuromuscular Disease Clinic
McMaster University H S C 2H22
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN KENT BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005